Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Jesus Contreras, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Order of Transfer
Date: March 17, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: March 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) ENVELOPE# 51934601 CHECK DISP ENVELOPE# 51934601 CHECK DISP |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDER ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDER ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Called STATE PRESENT. DEF. PRESENT WITH ATTY JESUS CONTRERAS. ALL PARTIES APPEARED VIA ZOOM. POSS C/S REDUCED TO $35,000.00C/S TAMPER/FABRICATE PHYS EVID W/INTENT TO IMPARE REDUCED TO $15,000.00C/S. AAG STATE PRESENT. DEF. PRESENT WITH ATTY JESUS CONTRERAS. ALL PARTIES APPEARED VIA ZOOM. POSS C/S REDUCED TO $35,000.00C/S TAMPER/FABRICATE PHYS EVID W/INTENT TO IMPARE REDUCED TO $15,000.00C/S. AAG |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Reporter DIANA PERIEA DIANA PERIEA |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER OF COMMITMENT ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ Returned Served | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order of Commitment Order of Commitment |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (9:45 AM) () 03/29/2021 Reset by Court to 03/29/2021 Result: Held | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus Other CANCELED Writ of Habeas Corpus (10:00 AM) () Other 03/26/2021 Reset by Court to 03/26/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.