Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Esquivel Et Ux, Bruce Lee, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Gregory T. Van Cleave, against Abbasi, Jubrail, Issa, Yousef, represented by Peter J Stanton, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Nonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Fiat | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Unsigned Order | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (11:00 AM) () | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.