Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rains, Claudia Ivonne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rains, John Paul, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Crawford, Jessica presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCrawford, Jessica Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Prove Up
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Counter-Petition
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreement
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Rains, John Paul Unserved
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Process
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.