Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Flores, Vanessa Marie, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Castaneda, Roberto G, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Madrigal, Dulce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMadrigal, Dulce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryAll Other Family Matters |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Madrigal, Dulce |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Madrigal, Dulce |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitute Service
Judge: Madrigal, Dulce |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Unserved
Judge: Madrigal, Dulce |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Process
Judge: Madrigal, Dulce |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation CASTANEDA, ROBERTO G Served 04/19/2021
Judge: Madrigal, Dulce |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Madrigal, Dulce |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Madrigal, Dulce |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Madrigal, Dulce |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.