Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Montanez, Adam Rene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Estevis, Cynthia, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Prove-Up (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Heather) | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order to be Signed by Judge | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Prove Up | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order to be Signed by Judge | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Issued | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Estevis, Cynthia Served 04/14/2021 Returned 07/21/2021 | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Process | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.