Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Coates, John Wheatley, Ii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Coates, Holly Hoover, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Counter-Petition | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation COATES, HOLLY HOOVER Served 04/21/2021 Returned 04/23/2021 | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Process | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Issued | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.