Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chan, Ha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Larry Littleton, against Veerkeralam Kuppusamy Eswara, Sridhar, represented by Margeaux Elissa Baker, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
No Fee Documents Index # 7
Date: August 12, 2021Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 8
Date: December 09, 2022Notice Index # 6
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 8 Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 8Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Expert Disclosures No Fee Documents Index # 7 No Fee Documents Index # 7Defendant's Expert Disclosures |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's First Notice of Intent to Introduce and Use as Evidence Business Records Accompanied by Notice Index # 6 Notice Index # 6Plaintiff's First Notice of Intent to Introduce and Use as Evidence Business Records Accompanied by Affidavit Concerning Costs and Necessity of Services |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5Defendant's Original Answer |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Return for Sridhar Veerkeralam Kuppusamy Eswara - Served 2/23/21 Officers Return Index # 4 Officers Return Index # 4Citation Return for Sridhar Veerkeralam Kuppusamy Eswara - Served 2/23/21 |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - Sridhar Veerkeralam Kuppusamy Eswara Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Sridhar Veerkeralam Kuppusamy Eswara |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet Case Information SheetCivil Case Information Sheet |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Process Request Index # 2 Request Index # 2Request for Process |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationPCT 4Veerkeralam Kuppusamy Eswara, SridharServed02/23/2021Returned02/23/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.