Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
J.G. Wentworth Originatios, Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Julie Pi Evans, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Argie D. Brame presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArgie D. Brame Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 6
Date: May 10, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 5
Date: May 04, 2021Notice Index # 4
Date: March 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Notice of Nonsuit Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 6 Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 6Order on Notice of Nonsuit |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit Motion (No Fee) Index # 5 Motion (No Fee) Index # 5Notice of Nonsuit |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Structured Settlement CANCELED Structured Settlement (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Brame, Argie, Brame, Argie) PassedStructured Settlement Hearing03/22/2021Reset by Court to 04/26/2021 |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Hearing Notice Index # 4 Notice Index # 4Amended Notice of Hearing |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Structured Settlement (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Brame, Argie, Brame, Argie) Structured Settlement Hearing | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Application for Approval of Transfer of Structured Annuity Benefits Amended Filing Index # 3 Amended Filing Index # 3Amended Application for Approval of Transfer of Structured Annuity Benefits |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on Application for Approval of Transfer Notice Index # 2 Notice Index # 2Notice of Hearing on Application for Approval of Transfer |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application for Approval of Transfer of Structured Annuity Benefits Application Index # 1 Application Index # 1Application for Approval of Transfer of Structured Annuity Benefits |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application for Approval of Transfer of Structured Annuity Benefits Application Index # 1Application for Approval of Transfer of Structured Annuity Benefits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.