Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Patel, Saloni, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Victoria M. Venza, against Patel, Nikhil, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts 328th District Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House328th District Court |
Order Index # 2
Date: February 12, 2021Officers Return Index # 16
Date: February 10, 2022Petition Index # 1
Date: February 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Officers Return Index # 16 Officers Return Index # 16IWO Return for Nikhil Patel. Issued on 10/29/2021 |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Officers Return Index # 16IWO Return for Nikhil Patel. Issued on 10/29/2021 | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
* Withholding - Notice of Issuance Index # 15 Issuance Index # 15IWO Issued to Nikhil Patel Cap Gemini |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | GarnishmentCMMR-9414 7266 9904 2162 3412 62Cap Gemini Returned Unserved 02/01/2022Returned02/01/2022 | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Issuance Index # 15IWO Issued to Nikhil Patel Cap Gemini | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
* Notice - Signed Final Decree of Divorce Notice of Final Decree Signed |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
* Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 14 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 14 |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
* Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 14 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 14 |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 14 | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Income Withholding for Support Order Index # 11 Order Index # 11Income Withholding for Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.