Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Diogu, Diogu Kalu, Ii, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Diogu Kalu Diogu Ii, Llm, James Okoro Okorafor, against Krenek, Eddie M, Krenek, Tricia, Melanson, David, Robbins, Denise, represented by Eddie M. Krenek, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Brame, Argie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrame, Argie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | LettersCover Letter from the First Court of Appeals - Clerks Record Received | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
*X Appeal - Form Letter/Receipt and Index LettersCopy of Receipt and Index Mailed to Parties - Tricia Krenek Returned Unable to Forward on 6/29/23 |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | LettersConfirmation from the First Court of Appeals - Clerks Record Sent | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
*X Appeal - Fee Notice LettersBill of Costs Mailed to Attorney |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cost Bill - Appeal - Redo Bill of Cost - OtherBill of Costs for One Volume of the Clerk's Record |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerks Record Complete-Index -Redo Clerks Record CompleteIndex of One Volume of the Clerk's Record (Re-created) |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Designation of Record Request Index # 56 Request Index # 56Designation of Record |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | LettersCover Letter from the First Court of Appeals - Court Reporters Record has Not Been Filed | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | LettersCover Letter from the First Court of Appeals - Notice of Nonpayment Recedived | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents Index # 55 No Fee Documents Index # 55Information Sheet from Trial Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.