Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Healthquest Therapeutics, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by M. Ali Zakaria, against Acreman, Jerry, Argo Group Us, Inc., represented by Robert Josey, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Removed to Federal Court Index # 7
Date: March 24, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6
Date: March 12, 2021Officers Return Index # 5
Date: March 01, 2021Issuance Index # 4
Date: February 11, 2021Issuance Index # 3
Date: February 11, 2021Petition Index # 1
Date: February 10, 2021Request Index # 2
Date: February 11, 2021Petition      Index # 1
Date: February 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Removal Removed to Federal Court Index # 7 Removed to Federal Court Index # 7Notice of Filing Removal |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Argonaut Insurance Company's Plea to the Jurisdiction and Original Answer Subject Thereto Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6Argonaut Insurance Company's Plea to the Jurisdiction and Original Answer Subject Thereto |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation for Argo Group US, Inc. Returned Served 2/22/21 Officers Return Index # 5 Officers Return Index # 5Citation for Argo Group US, Inc. Returned Served 2/22/21 |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - Jerry Acreman Issuance Index # 4 Issuance Index # 4Citation Issued to Jerry Acreman |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - Argo Group Inc Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Argo Group US, Inc. fka Argonaut Group, Inc. |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Process Request Index # 2 Request Index # 2Request for Process |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationeServiceAcreman, Jerry Unserved | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationeServiceArgo Group US, Inc.Served02/22/2021Returned03/01/2021 | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosures Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosures |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosures Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosures |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.