Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Washington, Avery, Washington, Ramona, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cheryl Elisa 'Cher' Bayley, John Arthur Daspit, against Geico County Mutual Insurance Company, represented by David H Bradley, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Jaramillo, Maggie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJaramillo, Maggie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a Plaintiffs' Original Petition to Defendant GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company. The plaintiffs, Avery Washington and Ramona Washington, are filing a lawsuit against GEICO for personal injuries sustained in a car accident. The ac...
Notice Index # 8
Date: January 20, 2022Other Disposition/Non-Final Index # 7
Date: April 20, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 6
Date: April 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jaramillo, Maggie P)
Judge: Jaramillo, Maggie P |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Vacation Letter 2022 Notice Index # 8 Notice Index # 8Vacation Letter 2022 |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Severance and Abatement Other Disposition/Non-Final Index # 7 Other Disposition/Non-Final Index # 7Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Severance and Abatement |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Severance and Abatement Motion (No Fee) Index # 6 Motion (No Fee) Index # 6Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Severance and Abatement |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant Geico County Mutual Insurance Company's Original Answer Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5Defendant Geico County Mutual Insurance Company's Original Answer |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee PaidJury Fee Paid by Defendant's Attorney | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation for Geico County Mutual Insurance Company Returned Served 2/23/21 Officers Return Index # 4 Officers Return Index # 4Citation for Geico County Mutual Insurance Company Returned Served 2/23/21 |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - Geico Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Geico County Mutual Insurance Company |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationeServiceGeico County Mutual Insurance CompanyServed02/23/2021Returned03/01/2021 | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Process Request Request Index # 2 Request Index # 2Civil Process Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.