Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mcintyre, Tracy D., filed a(n) Property Appraisal Appeal case represented by Colbert Nathaniel Coldwell, against Delgado, Tony, El Paso Central Appraisal District, Estrada, Alex, Ramirez, Ismael, represented by Carmen B Hegeman, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with M. Sue Kurita presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeM. Sue Kurita Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2020 |
CategoryProperty Appraisal Appeal |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Status/DWOP (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Kurita, M. Sue) | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Kurita, M. Sue) Result: Heard | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 22 | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 20 | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 21 | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 19 | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 18 | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Index # 17 | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Index # 16 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Kurita, M. Sue) 03/09/2023Reset by Court to 06/08/202306/08/2023Reset by Court to 06/08/2023 Result: Heard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.