Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Wright, Sr., Lewis C., Wright, Jr., Lewis C., Wright, Dana L., Wright, Constance T., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Chew, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChew, Linda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:30 AM) ()
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non Suit Doc ID# 8
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 7
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Doc ID# 6
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Partial Non-Suit
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 5
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
CitationWRIGHT, JR., LEWIS C.Served12/19/2016Returned12/20/2016WRIGHT, CONSTANCE T.Served12/19/2016Returned12/20/2016UNITED STATES OF AMERICA-IRSServed12/21/2016Response Received02/06/2017Returned12/28/2016
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Doc ID# 3
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Partial Non-Suit
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
CitationWRIGHT, SR., LEWIS C. Returned Unserved 05/04/2016Returned05/04/2016WRIGHT, DANA L. Returned Unserved 05/04/2016Returned05/04/2016WRIGHT, JR., LEWIS C. Returned Unserved 06/02/2016Returned06/02/2016WRIGHT, CONSTANCE T. Returned Unserved 06/02/2016Returned06/02/2016
Judge: Chew, Linda |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.