Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Avila, Silvia A., Avila, Jose Daniel, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Villa, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVilla, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment Doc ID# 14
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 13
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) Result: Granted
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 12
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
November 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Partial Non-Suit
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Disclaimer Doc ID# 11
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitute Service Doc ID# 10
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitute Service Doc ID# 9
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 8
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
CitationAVILA, JOSE DANIELServed08/10/2016Response Due09/05/2016Returned08/11/2016
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.