Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Alsa Group, Llc, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Chew, Linda JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ALSA GROUP, LLC, et al presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChew, Linda JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ALSA GROUP, LLC, et al Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment Doc ID# 10
Judge: Chew, Linda JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ALSA GROUP, LLC, et al |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Return
Judge: Chew, Linda JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ALSA GROUP, LLC, et al |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Return
Judge: Chew, Linda JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ALSA GROUP, LLC, et al |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Bill of Cost Doc ID# 9
Judge: Chew, Linda JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ALSA GROUP, LLC, et al |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Sale Doc ID# 8
Judge: Chew, Linda JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ALSA GROUP, LLC, et al |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter Doc ID# 7
Judge: Chew, Linda JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ALSA GROUP, LLC, et al |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 5
Judge: Chew, Linda JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ALSA GROUP, LLC, et al |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 6
Judge: Chew, Linda JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ALSA GROUP, LLC, et al |
|
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) Result: Default Judgment
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Doc ID# 4
Judge: Chew, Linda JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ALSA GROUP, LLC, et al |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.