Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Malooly, Raymond, Hernandez , Santiago, represented by Santiago David Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Chew, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChew, Linda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment Doc ID# 24
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Doc ID# 22
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Non-Military Service Doc ID# 21
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 23
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda)
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply Doc ID# 20
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 19
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response to Summary Judgment Doc ID# 18
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer Doc ID# 17
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Doc ID# 16
Judge: Chew, Linda |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.