Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Torres, Lazaro Ruben, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Veronica Teresa Lerma, against Tahuahua, Sergio, Keller Kustoms, Keller Brothers Automotive, Llc, represented by Luis C Labrado, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Garcia, Patrick M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarcia, Patrick M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practices |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scheduling/Status Conference CANCELED Scheduling/Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.) Cancelled Pending Reset Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scheduling/Status Conference CANCELED Scheduling/Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.) Reset Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 42 | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.) Reset Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 41 | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.)
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 40 | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 39 | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Scheduling/Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.)
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 38 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.