Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael J Scott, against Tavarez, Jennifer I., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Moody, William E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoody, William E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Moody, William E.) Non-Suit Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit Doc ID# 7
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Return
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 4
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 5
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
CitationTavarez, Jennifer I. Unserved
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter Doc ID# 2
Judge: Moody, William E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.