Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Antonio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Parent-Child Relationship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
FRD Civil Payment Plan
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
FRD-FEE-CIV
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order in Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Doc ID# 6
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
CitationGONZALEZ, JOELServed01/26/2016Response Due02/22/2016Returned01/28/2016
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeGONZALEZ, JOELServed01/26/2016Response Due02/22/2016Returned01/28/2016
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition in Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship Doc ID# 1
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.