Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzalez Fierro, Jose Heriberto, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Solorio, Claudia, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Leverton, Reed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeverton, Reed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Doc ID# 22 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed)
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 21 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: : Leverton, Reed |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Contested Entry of Judgment CANCELED Contested Entry of Judgment (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed) Reset Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed) Reset Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 20 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: : Leverton, Reed |
|
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order Doc ID# 19 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: : Leverton, Reed |
|
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed)
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 18 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: : Leverton, Reed |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed) Reset Judge: Leverton, Reed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.