Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | FRD-FEE-CIV | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order in Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order in Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service Doc ID# 6 | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Precept to ServeCRUZ, ROMANServed02/06/2016Response Due02/29/2016Returned02/08/2016 | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | CitationCRUZ, ROMANServed02/06/2016Response Due02/29/2016Returned02/08/2016 | |
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3 | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition in Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship Doc ID# 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.