Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jo Anne Bernal filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Gonzalez, Richard, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Locke, Michele L. presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Locke, Michele L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Locke, Michele L.)
Judge: Locke, Michele L. |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion Doc ID# 14 | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter Doc ID# 13 | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter Doc ID# 12 | |
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter Doc ID# 11 | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter Doc ID# 10 | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter Doc ID# 9 | |
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Copy Doc ID# 8 | |
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Information Sheet Doc ID# 7 | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Jose M) Result: Granted
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.