Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donald D Degrasse, against Luna, Victor M., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Garcia, Patrick M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarcia, Patrick M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery Doc ID# 15 | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 14 | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.)
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 13 | |
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference CANCELED Scheduling Conference (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.) Reset Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter Doc ID# 11 | |
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 12 | |
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 10 | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment Doc ID# 7 | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Military Service Doc ID# 9 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.