Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Aaron J Espinoza, against Occupant Of The Property, Stephenson, Mary T., Stephenson, Perry M., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Moody, William E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoody, William E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Doc ID# 8
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing (1:30 PM) ()
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 7
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter Doc ID# 6
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Military Service Doc ID# 4
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Doc ID# 5
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Doc ID# 3
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationSTEPHENSON, MARY T.Served12/30/2014Response Due01/26/2015STEPHENSON, STEPHENSON M.Served12/30/2014Response Due01/26/2015Occupant of the Property Returned Unserved 01/27/2015Returned01/27/2015
Judge: Moody, William E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.