Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bernabe, Reynaldo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bernabe, Maria, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Jesus presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Jesus Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 9 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Jesus) Result: Default Judgment
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationBERNABE, MARIAServed03/19/2015Response Due04/13/2015Returned03/26/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitute Service Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amended Motion Doc ID# 7
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationBERNABE, MARIA Unserved
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitute Service Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitute Service Doc ID# 5
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition for Divorce Doc ID# 1
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.