Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Castillo, Norma Guadalupe, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Gutierrez, Yahara L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGutierrez, Yahara L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryAll Other Family Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeDecree Of Name Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fingerprint Card Doc ID# 4
Judge: Gutierrez, Yahara L. |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Transfer Doc ID# 3 (Judicial Officer: Gutierrez, Yahara L. )
Judge: Gutierrez, Yahara L. |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Name Change Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Gutierrez, Yahara L.) Result: Granted
Judge: Gutierrez, Yahara L. |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fingerprint Card Returned Doc ID# 2
Judge: Gutierrez, Yahara L. |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Gutierrez, Yahara L. |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Gutierrez, Yahara L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.