Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Antonio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Support Doc ID# 13 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 12
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Child Support Review Order (Modification)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Investigator's Report Doc ID# 11
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order in Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 8
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Doc ID# 7
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeGARCIA, JESUS DAVIDServed01/28/2015Response Due02/23/2015Returned02/04/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationGARCIA, JESUS DAVIDServed01/28/2015Response Received02/17/2015Returned02/04/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.