Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alfaro, Sergio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by James B Kennedy, against Chavez, Petra Isela, represented by Rolando Morales, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Garcia, Patrick M. Comment (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE E-FILED ON 11-26-14/SF presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarcia, Patrick M. Comment (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE E-FILED ON 11-26-14/SF Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Conference (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.)
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. Comment (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE E-FILED ON 11-26-14/SF |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit Doc ID# 24
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. Comment (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE E-FILED ON 11-26-14/SF |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment/Dismissal Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.)
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. Comment (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE E-FILED ON 11-26-14/SF |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 23
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. Comment (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE E-FILED ON 11-26-14/SF |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Discovery Control Plan Doc ID# 22
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. Comment (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE E-FILED ON 11-26-14/SF |
|
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 21
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. Comment (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE E-FILED ON 11-26-14/SF |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (2:30 PM) ()
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. Comment (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE E-FILED ON 11-26-14/SF |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 18
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. Comment (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE E-FILED ON 11-26-14/SF |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 19
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. Comment (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE E-FILED ON 11-26-14/SF |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 20
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. Comment (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE E-FILED ON 11-26-14/SF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.