Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Western Refining, Inc., Western Refining Wholesale, Inc, Western Refining Company, L.P., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by J Wiley George, Victor F Poulos, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Barill, Angie Juarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarill, Angie Juarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Doc ID# 222
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 221
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Call CANCELED Docket Call (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Barill, Angie Juarez) Settled Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing CANCELED Final Pre-Trial Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Barill, Angie Juarez) Settled Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Doc ID# 216
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Witness List Doc ID# 217
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Witness List Doc ID# 218
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Doc ID# 219
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Doc ID# 220
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Barill, Angie Juarez)
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.