Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weststar Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jason Paul Hungerford, against Lloyd David Williams D B A Ep Foot Care, P.A., Foot Care Properties, Ltd, Foot Care Management, Llc, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 5 | |
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment Doc ID# 3 | |
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Address Doc ID# 4 | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | CitationFOOT CARE PROPERTIES, LTDServed01/08/2013Returned01/09/2013FOOT CARE MANAGEMENT, LLCServed01/08/2013Returned01/09/2013LLOYD DAVID WILLIAMS d/b/a EP FOOT CARE, P.A.Served01/08/2013Returned01/09/2013 | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2 | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.