Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by State Of Texas, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Antonio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 9
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio) 05/08/2013Reset by Court to 07/24/2013
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Doc ID# 6
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeVasquez, DiegoServed04/23/2013Response Due05/20/2013Returned04/25/2013
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
CitationVasquez, DiegoServed04/23/2013Response Due05/20/2013Returned04/25/2013
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 4
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.