Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores, Gaston, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Claudio Flores, Jr., against Garcia, Berenice Zapata, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with JUAREZ, JOSE Converted Disposition:Party: GARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATA Disposition: DECREE,P/C SUIT Non-Jury Trial presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUAREZ, JOSE Converted Disposition:Party: GARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATA Disposition: DECREE,P/C SUIT Non-Jury Trial Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryParent Child - Non-Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFamily Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JUAREZ, JOSE)
Judge: JUAREZ, JOSE Converted Disposition:Party: GARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATA Disposition: DECREE,P/C SUIT Non-Jury Trial |
|
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JUAREZ, JOSE) Result: Submitted
Judge: JUAREZ, JOSE Converted Disposition:Party: GARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATA Disposition: DECREE,P/C SUIT Non-Jury Trial |
|
October 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JUAREZ, JOSE) Result: No Show
Judge: JUAREZ, JOSE Converted Disposition:Party: GARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATA Disposition: DECREE,P/C SUIT Non-Jury Trial |
|
September 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: JUAREZ, JOSE Converted Disposition:Party: GARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATA Disposition: DECREE,P/C SUIT Non-Jury Trial |
|
August 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JUAREZ, JOSE) Result: Reviewed
Judge: JUAREZ, JOSE Converted Disposition:Party: GARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATA Disposition: DECREE,P/C SUIT Non-Jury Trial |
|
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JUAREZ, JOSE) Result: No Show
Judge: JUAREZ, JOSE Converted Disposition:Party: GARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATA Disposition: DECREE,P/C SUIT Non-Jury Trial |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Findings and Recommendations
Judge: JUAREZ, JOSE Converted Disposition:Party: GARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATA Disposition: DECREE,P/C SUIT Non-Jury Trial |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JUAREZ, JOSE) Result: Heard
Judge: JUAREZ, JOSE Converted Disposition:Party: GARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATA Disposition: DECREE,P/C SUIT Non-Jury Trial |
|
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: JUAREZ, JOSE Converted Disposition:Party: GARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATA Disposition: DECREE,P/C SUIT Non-Jury Trial |
|
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining OrderGARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATAServed05/30/2008
Judge: JUAREZ, JOSE Converted Disposition:Party: GARCIA, BERENICE ZAPATA Disposition: DECREE,P/C SUIT Non-Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.