Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dro, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Quinonez, Julia Y, Carrasco, Abram Julian, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Macias, Patricia A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMacias, Patricia A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryEnforcement |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Income Withholding for Support | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Administrative Writ of Withholding Doc ID# 11 | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Termination Order Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Herrera, Mike )
Judge: : Herrera, Mike |
|
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Jesus) Result: Granted
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Terminate Doc ID# 9 | |
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Hearing CANCELED Motion to Withdraw Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Herrera, Mike) Agreed Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Government Exemption Doc ID# 7 | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Herrera, Mike) 12/14/2011Reset by Court to 01/09/201201/09/2012Reset by Court to 12/14/2011
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.