Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Unkwn Heir Estte William M Agner, Deceased, Unkwn Heir Estte Richard Genera, Deceased, Unkwn Heir Estte Helen G Davenport, Deceased, Unkwn Heir Estte Beatrice G Robin, Deceased, Shindo, Jennie, (total of 10) See All represented by Ricardo Gonzalez, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: SHINDO, JENNIE Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVilla, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: SHINDO, JENNIE Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2004 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
ACREL
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: SHINDO, JENNIE Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Granting
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: SHINDO, JENNIE Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
July 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
PEP
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: SHINDO, JENNIE Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: SHINDO, JENNIE Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Return
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: SHINDO, JENNIE Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Return
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: SHINDO, JENNIE Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Bill of Cost
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: SHINDO, JENNIE Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORSR
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: SHINDO, JENNIE Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: SHINDO, JENNIE Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order for Attorney Ad Litem Fees
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: SHINDO, JENNIE Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.