Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Vargas, Robert, Vargas, Nora, Tornillo Land Company, represented by John W Welsh, Jr., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Chew, Linda Converted Disposition:Party: VARGAS, ROBERT Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChew, Linda Converted Disposition:Party: VARGAS, ROBERT Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2004 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment
Judge: Chew, Linda Converted Disposition:Party: VARGAS, ROBERT Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
August 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion for New Trial (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) Result: Heard
Judge: Chew, Linda Converted Disposition:Party: VARGAS, ROBERT Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
August 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Response
Judge: Chew, Linda Converted Disposition:Party: VARGAS, ROBERT Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
August 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Chew, Linda Converted Disposition:Party: VARGAS, ROBERT Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Transmittal
Judge: Chew, Linda Converted Disposition:Party: VARGAS, ROBERT Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion for New Trial
Judge: Chew, Linda Converted Disposition:Party: VARGAS, ROBERT Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
NJUD
Judge: Chew, Linda Converted Disposition:Party: VARGAS, ROBERT Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Chew, Linda Converted Disposition:Party: VARGAS, ROBERT Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
July 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address
Judge: Chew, Linda Converted Disposition:Party: VARGAS, ROBERT Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
July 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda)
Judge: Chew, Linda Converted Disposition:Party: VARGAS, ROBERT Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.