Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Hickman, Cherie L., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: HICKMAN, CHERIE L. Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(HICKMAN, CHERIE L.Judgment: ( - Other presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: HICKMAN, CHERIE L. Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(HICKMAN, CHERIE L.Judgment: ( - Other Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2003 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MARQUEZ, EDWARD S.) Result: Non-Suited
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: HICKMAN, CHERIE L. Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(HICKMAN, CHERIE L.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
April 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: HICKMAN, CHERIE L. Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(HICKMAN, CHERIE L.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MARQUEZ, EDWARD S.) Result: RESET
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: HICKMAN, CHERIE L. Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(HICKMAN, CHERIE L.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: HICKMAN, CHERIE L. Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(HICKMAN, CHERIE L.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
June 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: HICKMAN, CHERIE L. Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(HICKMAN, CHERIE L.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
April 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
CitationHICKMAN, CHERIE L.Served06/12/2004
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: HICKMAN, CHERIE L. Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(HICKMAN, CHERIE L.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
April 09, 2004 | Docket Event |
CITSH
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: HICKMAN, CHERIE L. Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(HICKMAN, CHERIE L.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
December 11, 2003 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: HICKMAN, CHERIE L. Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(HICKMAN, CHERIE L.Judgment: ( - Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.