Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Jimarez, Teresa Individually & Heir Of Estate Of Ramon Jimarez, Sr., Jimarez, Ramon, Jimarez, Martha, Individually & Heir Of Estate Of Ramon Jimarez, Sr., Jimarez, Jr., Ramon Individually & Heir Of Estate Of Ramon Jimarez, Sr., Jimarez, Alfred Individually & Heir Of Estate Of Ramon Jimarez, Sr., (total of 6) See All represented by Daniel Anchondo, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONJudgment: ( - Other presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONJudgment: ( - Other Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2001 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: Non-Suited
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONJudgment: ( - Other |
|
February 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONJudgment: ( - Other |
|
January 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: Non-Suited
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONJudgment: ( - Other |
|
December 15, 2003 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONJudgment: ( - Other |
|
November 18, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONJudgment: ( - Other |
|
September 09, 2002 | Docket Event |
MOTIONMPNS
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONJudgment: ( - Other |
|
September 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: RESET
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONJudgment: ( - Other |
|
August 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONJudgment: ( - Other |
|
August 14, 2002 | Docket Event |
Disclaimer
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONJudgment: ( - Other |
|
August 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONJudgment: ( - Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.