Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Villasenor, Magdalena, Villasenor, Jose L, Quintero, Pedro, Quintero, Margarita, represented by Fred J Morton, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: QUINTERO, MARGARITA Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(QUINTERO, MARGARITAJudgment: ( - Other presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: QUINTERO, MARGARITA Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(QUINTERO, MARGARITAJudgment: ( - Other Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2001 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: QUINTERO, MARGARITA Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(QUINTERO, MARGARITAJudgment: ( - Other |
|
January 29, 2003 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: Non-Suited
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: QUINTERO, MARGARITA Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(QUINTERO, MARGARITAJudgment: ( - Other |
|
October 30, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: QUINTERO, MARGARITA Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(QUINTERO, MARGARITAJudgment: ( - Other |
|
August 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
Answer
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: QUINTERO, MARGARITA Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(QUINTERO, MARGARITAJudgment: ( - Other |
|
August 09, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: QUINTERO, MARGARITA Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(QUINTERO, MARGARITAJudgment: ( - Other |
|
August 08, 2002 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: RESET
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: QUINTERO, MARGARITA Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(QUINTERO, MARGARITAJudgment: ( - Other |
|
July 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
CITSH
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: QUINTERO, MARGARITA Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(QUINTERO, MARGARITAJudgment: ( - Other |
|
July 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
CitationQUINTERO, PEDROServed08/14/2002
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: QUINTERO, MARGARITA Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(QUINTERO, MARGARITAJudgment: ( - Other |
|
July 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
CitationQUINTERO, MARGARITAServed08/14/2002
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: QUINTERO, MARGARITA Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(QUINTERO, MARGARITAJudgment: ( - Other |
|
July 11, 2002 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: QUINTERO, MARGARITA Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(QUINTERO, MARGARITAJudgment: ( - Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.