Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Vasquez, Roberto, Vasquez, Eduviges, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: VASQUEZ, EDUVIGES Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(VASQUEZ, EDUVIGESJudgment: ( - Other presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: VASQUEZ, EDUVIGES Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(VASQUEZ, EDUVIGESJudgment: ( - Other Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2001 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: VASQUEZ, EDUVIGES Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(VASQUEZ, EDUVIGESJudgment: ( - Other |
|
June 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MARTINEZ, PHILIP R.)
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: VASQUEZ, EDUVIGES Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(VASQUEZ, EDUVIGESJudgment: ( - Other |
|
June 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order to Transfer
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: VASQUEZ, EDUVIGES Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(VASQUEZ, EDUVIGESJudgment: ( - Other |
|
March 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: VASQUEZ, EDUVIGES Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(VASQUEZ, EDUVIGESJudgment: ( - Other |
|
March 12, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order to Retain
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: VASQUEZ, EDUVIGES Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(VASQUEZ, EDUVIGESJudgment: ( - Other |
|
March 12, 2002 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: VASQUEZ, EDUVIGES Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(VASQUEZ, EDUVIGESJudgment: ( - Other |
|
March 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: VASQUEZ, EDUVIGES Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(VASQUEZ, EDUVIGESJudgment: ( - Other |
|
March 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MARTINEZ, PHILIP R.)
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: VASQUEZ, EDUVIGES Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(VASQUEZ, EDUVIGESJudgment: ( - Other |
|
January 23, 2002 | Docket Event |
Tax Citation
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: VASQUEZ, EDUVIGES Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(VASQUEZ, EDUVIGESJudgment: ( - Other |
|
January 23, 2002 | Docket Event |
CitationVASQUEZ, EDUVIGESServed02/20/2002
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: VASQUEZ, EDUVIGES Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(VASQUEZ, EDUVIGESJudgment: ( - Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.