Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Quiroz, Peggy, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: QUIROZ, PEGGY Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: QUIROZ, PEGGY Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2001 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: QUIROZ, PEGGY Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
February 07, 2003 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: QUIROZ, PEGGY Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
January 17, 2003 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: QUIROZ, PEGGY Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
January 16, 2003 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: Granted
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: QUIROZ, PEGGY Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: QUIROZ, PEGGY Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
July 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: QUIROZ, PEGGY Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
July 12, 2002 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: RESET
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: QUIROZ, PEGGY Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
June 19, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: QUIROZ, PEGGY Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
January 11, 2002 | Docket Event |
CitationQUIROZ, PEGGYServed01/24/2002
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: QUIROZ, PEGGY Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
January 11, 2002 | Docket Event |
Tax Citation
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: QUIROZ, PEGGY Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.