Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Edward Hernandez, against Lopez, Patricia F, Lopez, Jose R, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: LOPEZ, PATRICIA F Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(LOPEZ, PATRICIA FJudgment: ( - Other presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: LOPEZ, PATRICIA F Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(LOPEZ, PATRICIA FJudgment: ( - Other Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2001 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: LOPEZ, PATRICIA F Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(LOPEZ, PATRICIA FJudgment: ( - Other |
|
August 15, 2002 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Citation
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: LOPEZ, PATRICIA F Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(LOPEZ, PATRICIA FJudgment: ( - Other |
|
July 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Peca, Peter S.)
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: LOPEZ, PATRICIA F Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(LOPEZ, PATRICIA FJudgment: ( - Other |
|
April 08, 2002 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: LOPEZ, PATRICIA F Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(LOPEZ, PATRICIA FJudgment: ( - Other |
|
December 13, 2001 | Docket Event |
CitationLOPEZ, PATRICIA FServed12/19/2001Response Due01/14/2002
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: LOPEZ, PATRICIA F Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(LOPEZ, PATRICIA FJudgment: ( - Other |
|
December 13, 2001 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: LOPEZ, PATRICIA F Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(LOPEZ, PATRICIA FJudgment: ( - Other |
|
December 13, 2001 | Docket Event |
CitationLOPEZ, JOSE RServed12/19/2001Response Due01/14/2002
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: LOPEZ, PATRICIA F Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(LOPEZ, PATRICIA FJudgment: ( - Other |
|
December 04, 2001 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: LOPEZ, PATRICIA F Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(LOPEZ, PATRICIA FJudgment: ( - Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.