Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Edward Hernandez, against Martinez, Johnny, represented by William B Crout, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, JOHNNY Disposition: JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, JOHNNY Disposition: JUDGMENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2000 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2001 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: Granted
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, JOHNNY Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
September 20, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, JOHNNY Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
September 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: RESET
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, JOHNNY Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
July 10, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, JOHNNY Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
March 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Civil Service Answer Default (Response Case Event)
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, JOHNNY Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
January 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
CitationMARTINEZ, JOHNNYServed03/07/2001Response Received03/23/2001
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, JOHNNY Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
January 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
CITSH
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, JOHNNY Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
December 18, 2000 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, JOHNNY Disposition: JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.