Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Bank Of Texas N.A., filed a(n) Property Appraisal Appeal case represented by James Popp, against El Paso County Appraisal District, represented by Robert Mott, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2000 |
CategoryProperty Appraisal Appeal |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: Agreed
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
January 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
MOTIONMPSJ
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
December 02, 2003 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: RESET
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
July 10, 2003 | Docket Event |
Designation of Expert Witness
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
May 01, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
April 14, 2003 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.)
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
February 05, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
May 02, 2002 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: MEDIATION
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
April 08, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
March 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: Heard
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.