Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Knapp, R.E., represented by Sam S Sipes, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: KNAPP, R.E. Disposition: JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: KNAPP, R.E. Disposition: JUDGMENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2000 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2003 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: KNAPP, R.E. Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
January 29, 2002 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: Granted
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: KNAPP, R.E. Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
November 20, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: KNAPP, R.E. Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
March 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
Civil Service Answer Default (Response Case Event)
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: KNAPP, R.E. Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
March 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
Answer
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: KNAPP, R.E. Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
December 22, 2000 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: KNAPP, R.E. Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
December 22, 2000 | Docket Event |
CitationKNAPP, R.E.Served02/19/2001Response Received03/28/2001
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: KNAPP, R.E. Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
December 01, 2000 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: KNAPP, R.E. Disposition: JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.