Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Artalejo, Rick, Artalejo, John, Artalejo Motor Co, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: ARTALEJO MOTOR CO, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVilla, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: ARTALEJO MOTOR CO, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2000 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2003 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: ARTALEJO MOTOR CO, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
December 16, 2003 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: ARTALEJO MOTOR CO, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
December 15, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: ARTALEJO MOTOR CO, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
December 15, 2003 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos) Result: Heard
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: ARTALEJO MOTOR CO, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 19, 2002 | Docket Event |
CITSH
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: ARTALEJO MOTOR CO, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 19, 2002 | Docket Event |
CitationARTALEJO, JOHN Returned Unserved 12/21/2002Returned12/21/2002
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: ARTALEJO MOTOR CO, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 19, 2002 | Docket Event |
CitationARTALEJO, RICK Returned Unserved 12/21/2002Returned12/21/2002
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: ARTALEJO MOTOR CO, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
January 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
CitationARTALEJO, JOHN Returned Unserved 04/18/2002Returned04/18/2002
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: ARTALEJO MOTOR CO, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
January 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: ARTALEJO MOTOR CO, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
January 10, 2002 | Docket Event |
CitationARTALEJO, RICKServed04/04/2002
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: ARTALEJO MOTOR CO, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.