Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Edward Hernandez, against Martinez, Phil, Jr., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, PHIL Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(MARTINEZ, PHIL, Jr.Judgment: ( - Other presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, PHIL Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(MARTINEZ, PHIL, Jr.Judgment: ( - Other Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2000 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MARTINEZ, PHILIP R.)
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, PHIL Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(MARTINEZ, PHIL, Jr.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
October 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, PHIL Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(MARTINEZ, PHIL, Jr.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
September 21, 2001 | Docket Event |
CitationMARTINEZ, PHIL Returned Unserved 11/12/2001Returned11/12/2001
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, PHIL Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(MARTINEZ, PHIL, Jr.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
September 21, 2001 | Docket Event |
Tax Citation
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, PHIL Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(MARTINEZ, PHIL, Jr.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
September 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, PHIL Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(MARTINEZ, PHIL, Jr.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
September 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order to Retain
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, PHIL Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(MARTINEZ, PHIL, Jr.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
September 06, 2001 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, PHIL Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(MARTINEZ, PHIL, Jr.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
September 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MARTINEZ, PHILIP R.)
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, PHIL Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(MARTINEZ, PHIL, Jr.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
August 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
CitationMARTINEZ, PHIL Returned Unserved 09/06/2001Returned09/06/2001
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, PHIL Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(MARTINEZ, PHIL, Jr.Judgment: ( - Other |
|
August 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
Tax Citation
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: MARTINEZ, PHIL Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(MARTINEZ, PHIL, Jr.Judgment: ( - Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.