Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Edward Hernandez, against Gandara, David, Gandara, Arthur, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with MARTINEZ, PHILIP R. Converted Disposition:Party: GANDARA, ARTHUR Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Judgment : For Plaintiff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMARTINEZ, PHILIP R. Converted Disposition:Party: GANDARA, ARTHUR Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Judgment : For Plaintiff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2000 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment
Judge: MARTINEZ, PHILIP R. Converted Disposition:Party: GANDARA, ARTHUR Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Judgment : For Plaintiff |
|
April 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: MARTINEZ, PHILIP R. Converted Disposition:Party: GANDARA, ARTHUR Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Judgment : For Plaintiff |
|
March 29, 2001 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address
Judge: MARTINEZ, PHILIP R. Converted Disposition:Party: GANDARA, ARTHUR Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Judgment : For Plaintiff |
|
March 21, 2001 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MARTINEZ, PHILIP R.)
Judge: MARTINEZ, PHILIP R. Converted Disposition:Party: GANDARA, ARTHUR Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Judgment : For Plaintiff |
|
January 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
CITSH
Judge: MARTINEZ, PHILIP R. Converted Disposition:Party: GANDARA, ARTHUR Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Judgment : For Plaintiff |
|
January 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
CitationGANDARA, ARTHURServed02/02/2001Response Due02/26/2001
Judge: MARTINEZ, PHILIP R. Converted Disposition:Party: GANDARA, ARTHUR Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Judgment : For Plaintiff |
|
January 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
CitationGANDARA, DAVIDServed02/02/2001Response Due02/26/2001
Judge: MARTINEZ, PHILIP R. Converted Disposition:Party: GANDARA, ARTHUR Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Judgment : For Plaintiff |
|
January 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss
Judge: MARTINEZ, PHILIP R. Converted Disposition:Party: GANDARA, ARTHUR Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Judgment : For Plaintiff |
|
December 18, 2000 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Judge: MARTINEZ, PHILIP R. Converted Disposition:Party: GANDARA, ARTHUR Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Judgment : For Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.