Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilkins, Robert, Iii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wilkins, Lynnett, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce No Children |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | TRO Hearing | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order and ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS IS SET FOR APRIL 1, 2021 AT 8:45 A.M |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served - by Private Process Server CITATION, ON MARCH 16, 2021 |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
COUNTERCLAIM ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Cover Sheet | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce (OCA) | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation EMAILED TO THE ATTORNEY |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Vital Statistics Information (Form VS-165) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.