Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Young, Megan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ford, Fabian, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2022 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Inventory, Appraisement and List of Claims | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | CO-PARENTING EDUCATION - CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION BY | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Order or Judgment to Pro Se Party | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Employer Order | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Order | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING SET FOR: JANUARY 25, 2022 AT 1:30 PM |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
10-DAY LETTER - REQUESTS ENTRY OF ORDER IF NO OBJECTION MADE BY OPPOSING PARTY |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL HEARING SET FOR: SEPTEMBER 10, 2021 AT 10:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.